Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Personal Property Tax - Investments in Maryland
Sponsored by
Delegates Fisher, Afzali, Aumann, Cluster, Dwyer, Frank, George, Glass, Hershey, Hough, K. Kelly, McComas, McDermott, Myers, Norman, Ready, Schuh, Serafini, and Smigiel
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing an exemption from personal property tax for property that is owned by a business that has organized under the laws of Maryland during the current tax year or that relocates its headquarters to Maryland during the current tax year; exempting all personal property other than operating personal property of a railroad or public utility from a property tax imposed by a county or municipality for all taxable years after June 30, 2015; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1065 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2013 2/07/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-245, 7-402 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM