Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Firearms - Transfer
Sponsored by
Delegates Dumais and Rosenberg
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a court to inform a person convicted of a specified offense that the person is prohibited from possessing a firearm under specified provisions of law; providing that if a person commits a specified offense and the offense is a domestically related crime, the court shall order the person to transfer all firearms owned by the person or in the person's possession; providing for the procedure to transfer firearms; authorizing the disposal of a firearm under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0530
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/12/2015 2/12/2015 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/18/2015 3/19/2015 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-233, 6-234 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM