Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Tax Sales - Foreclosure of Right of Redemption - Naming of Defendants
Sponsored by
Delegates D. Barnes, Ebersole, Fennell, Hornberger, Knotts, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Simonaire, Tarlau, and M. Washington
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 243
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing requirements for naming of the defendants in an action to foreclose the right of redemption on property sold at a tax sale; and establishing requirements for filing a specified affidavit in an action to foreclose the right of redemption on property sold at a tax sale.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Tax Sales - Foreclosure of Right of Redemption - Naming of Defendants
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Tax Sales - Foreclosure of Right of Redemption - Naming of Defendants
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Reassigned to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 243
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Tax Sales - Foreclosure of Right of Redemption - Naming of Defendants
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 4/03/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/03/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 61A
Text - Third - Tax Sales - Foreclosure of Right of Redemption - Naming of Defendants
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 62
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Referred Rules 59
Senate 4/05/2017 4/06/2017 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Reassigned to Budget and Taxation 60
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 63A
House 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Returned Passed 69
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 243
Text - Chapter - Tax Sales - Foreclosure of Right of Redemption - Naming of Defendants
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-836 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM