Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Utilities - Underground Facilities - Time-Sensitive Ticket
Sponsored by
Delegates Hornberger, Arikan, Griffith, Jacobs, and Krebs
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring an owner-member whose underground facility provides broadband service to mark the location of the underground facility within 4 hours after a time-sensitive ticket is transferred to the owner-member; and defining "time-sensitive ticket" as a ticket that the person initiating a ticket request identifies as requiring an owner-member to mark its underground facility promptly in order to minimize damage to property; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Utilities - Underground Facilities - Time-Sensitive Ticket
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2020
Legislative Date
2/20/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Public Utilities - Underground Facilities - Time-Sensitive Ticket
House 2/20/2020 2/20/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   12-101, 12-126 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:09 PM
Click to return on the top page