Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Historic Revitalization Tax Credit - Transferability, Funding, and Extension (Historic Revitalization Tax Credit Improvement Act of 2020)
Sponsored by
Delegates Smith, Buckel, and Lierman
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Making a certain tax credit for commercial rehabilitations under the historic revitalization tax credit program transferable and refundable under certain circumstances; requiring the Governor to include in the annual State budget an appropriation of at least $15,000,000 in fiscal year 2022, increasing in each intervening fiscal year up to $30,000,000 in fiscal year 2025, for the tax credit reserve fund; extending the tax credit through fiscal year 2028; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2019; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0978
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Historic Revitalization Tax Credit - Transferability, Funding, and Extension (Historic Revitalization Tax Credit Improvement Act of 2020)
House 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/14/2020 8:12 AM