Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vital Records - New Certificates of Birth - Sex Change or Diagnosis of an Intersex Condition
Sponsored by
Delegates Moon, Cullison, Barkley, Carr, Fraser-Hidalgo, Gutierrez, Kaiser, Kelly, Korman, Lam, Luedtke, McIntosh, Morales, Platt, Reznik, S. Robinson, Rosenberg, Smith, Tarlau, M. Washington, and Zucker
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 485
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Secretary of Health and Mental Hygiene, under specified circumstances, to make a new certificate of birth for an individual whose sex has been changed or who has been diagnosed with an intersex condition; requiring that a specified sex designation and, under specified circumstances, a specified name be on the new certificate of birth; prohibiting a new certificate of birth from having specified markings or showing on its face specified changes; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0743
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {446587/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Special Order until next session (Delegate McComas) Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Impallaria) {863120/1 Rejected (45-86)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Parrott) {633123/1 Rejected (44-91)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/22/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (85-50)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/22/2015
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2015
Legislative Date
3/26/2015
Action
Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (31-16)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/28/2015
Legislative Date
5/30/2015
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 485
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/20/2015 3/23/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 Favorable with Amendments {446587/1 Report Adopted 50
House 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 Special Order until next session (Delegate McComas) Adopted 50
House 3/23/2015 3/21/2015 Floor Amendment (Delegate Impallaria) {863120/1 Rejected (45-86) 51
House 3/23/2015 3/21/2015 Floor Amendment (Delegate Parrott) {633123/1 Rejected (44-91) 51
House 3/23/2015 3/21/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51
House 3/24/2015 3/22/2015 Third Reading Passed (85-50) 52
Senate 3/25/2015 3/22/2015 First Reading Finance 49
Senate 3/26/2015 3/26/2015 Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/07/2015 4/08/2015 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/08/2015 4/01/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/08/2015 4/01/2015 Second Reading Passed 59
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 Third Reading Passed (31-16) 60
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Returned Passed 65
Post Passage 5/28/2015 5/30/2015 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 485
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-201, 4-211, 4-214 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM