Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Hazing - Elements and Penalties
Sponsored by
Delegates McComas, Chang, Jones, McDonough, B. Robinson, and West
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that a person may not recklessly or intentionally do an act or create a situation that subjects a student to the risk of mental or emotional distress; providing that specified penalties apply to a specified offense; and altering specified penalties.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/13/2015 2/13/2015 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/18/2015 3/19/2015 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-607 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM