Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - Eminent Domain - Limitations on Condemnation Authority
Sponsored by
Delegates Morhaim, Cardin, and Stein
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Proposing amendments to the Maryland Constitution to limit the condemnation of private property to public uses under specified circumstances; prohibiting the General Assembly from enacting any law for the taking of private property for public use without requiring the condemning authority to issue a statement of the public necessity for the taking and a public hearing with an opportunity for public comment; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Details
Constitutional Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Contingency - on a referendum
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2013
Legislative Date
2/18/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2013 2/07/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 2/07/2013 2/07/2013 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 2/15/2013 2/18/2013 Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   40, 40A, 40B, 40C, 61 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM