Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Duties of a Guardian of the Person - Petition for Visitation
Sponsored by
Delegates Saab, Anderton, Arikan, Bagnall, B. Barnes, Barron, Beitzel, Boteler, Buckel, Cassilly, Charles, Chisholm, Corderman, Cox, Fennell, Glenn, Grammer, Hornberger, Howard, Jalisi, Johnson, Kelly, Kittleman, Korman, Krebs, R. Lewis, Lisanti, Long, Malone, Mautz, McComas, McKay, Metzgar, Mosby, Pena-Melnyk, Proctor, Qi, Reilly, Reznik, Rose, Sample-Hughes, Shoemaker, Szeliga, and Wivell
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Establishing the intent of the General Assembly to enforce the right of every adult in the State to visit with and receive certain communication from whomever the adult chooses, with a certain exception; establishing a rebuttable presumption in an action under the Act; authorizing a certain person to petition a certain court for reasonable visitation with a certain alleged incapacitated or protected person; requiring the petition to be verified and to state certain facts; providing for service of process; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0675
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Duties of a Guardian of the Person - Petition for Visitation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/21/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/21/2019
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/01/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Duties of a Guardian of the Person - Petition for Visitation
House 2/21/2019 2/21/2019 Hearing canceled
House 2/21/2019 2/21/2019 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/01/2019 3/01/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-101, 15-102 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM