Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland False Claims Act
Sponsored by
Delegates Arora, Afzali, Anderson, Barkley, Bobo, Carter, Clippinger, Conaway, Dumais, Frush, McDermott, Niemann, B. Robinson, Rosenberg, Simmons, Smigiel, Sophocleus, Swain, F. Turner, Valderrama, Vallario, and Waldstreicher
Status
In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting specified actions constituting false claims against a governmental entity; providing specified penalties for making false claims; requiring the court to consider and give special attention to specified factors in determining the amount of fines and penalties to be levied under the Act; authorizing a person and the governmental entity to file a civil action against a person that makes a specified false claim under specified circumstances; providing that this Act does not apply to specified claims, records or statements; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0509 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/15/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {822018/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Special Order until next session (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (93-37)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
4/04/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {308872/1
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Laid Over (Senator Getty) Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {308872/1
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Brinkley) Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {308872/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Getty) {213326/1 Rejected (18-29)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Motion Special Order until later today (Senator Brinkley) Rejected (17-29)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Motion Postpone Indefinitely (Senator Brinkley) Adopted (26-20)
Proceedings
64
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2014 2/05/2014 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/15/2014 3/15/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/15/2014 3/12/2014 Favorable with Amendments {822018/1 Report Adopted 48A
House 3/15/2014 3/12/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48A
House 3/17/2014 3/13/2014 Special Order until next session (Delegate Kipke) Adopted 49
House 3/17/2014 3/14/2014 Third Reading Passed (93-37) 50
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 47
Senate 3/19/2014 3/19/2014 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/03/2014 4/04/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Favorable with Amendments {308872/1 60
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Laid Over (Senator Getty) Adopted 60
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Favorable with Amendments {308872/1 62
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Special Order until later today (Senator Brinkley) Adopted 62
Senate 4/07/2014 3/29/2014 Favorable with Amendments {308872/1 Report Adopted 63
Senate 4/07/2014 3/29/2014 Floor Amendment (Senator Getty) {213326/1 Rejected (18-29) 63
Senate 4/07/2014 3/29/2014 Motion Special Order until later today (Senator Brinkley) Rejected (17-29) 63
Senate 4/07/2014 3/29/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63
Senate 4/07/2014 3/30/2014 Motion Postpone Indefinitely (Senator Brinkley) Adopted (26-20) 64
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-101 through 8-111 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM