Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Information Act - State Public Information Act Compliance Board and State Policy
Sponsored by
Delegates Carter, Oaks, and B. Robinson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the State Public Information Act Compliance Board; providing for the powers and duties of the Board; authorizing any person to file a specified complaint with the Board; requiring that the complaint contain specified information and be signed by the complainant; requiring the Board to take specified action regarding a complaint; requiring a custodian who receives a complaint from the Board to file a specified response within a specified time period; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/13/2015 3/17/2015 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-101, 4-104, 4-1A-01 through 4-1A-09, 4-361 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM