Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Retirement Income and Task Force to Study Senior Emigration
Sponsored by
Delegate Hogan
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing the maximum amount allowed as a subtraction modification under the State income tax for specified retirement income of an individual who is at least 70 years old or who is totally disabled; establishing a task force to study specified effects of State and local tax policies on senior emigration; applying the Act to taxable years after December 31, 2013; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0451
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0440 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2014
Legislative Date
2/25/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2014 2/05/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/06/2014 2/06/2014 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/25/2014 2/25/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 3/03/2014 3/03/2014 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-209 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM