Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study Chronic Absenteeism in Maryland's Public Schools
Sponsored by
Delegates Cullison, Gutierrez, Haynes, Howard, Ivey, Luedtke, A. Miller, Olszewski, Stukes, and M. Washington
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Study Chronic Absenteeism in Maryland's Public Schools; requiring the Task Force to collect and analyze specified data, evaluate local and national strategies and best practices to address chronic absenteeism, identify responses to chronic absenteeism that rely on prevention and intervention, and make specified recommendations; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2014; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0715
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2014 2/05/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/06/2014 2/06/2014 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM