Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Wage Payment and Collection Law - Awards of Certain Fees and Costs and Prohibition Against Retaliation
Sponsored by
Delegates Smith, Barkley, McCray, Moon, Morales, Sanchez, Tarlau, and A. Washington
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a court, on a specified finding in an action on behalf of an employee for a violation of the Maryland Wage Payment and Collection Law, to award the Attorney General reasonable counsel fees and other costs; authorizing a court, on a specified finding in an action by an employee for a violation of the Wage Payment and Collection Law, to award the employee reasonable counsel fees and other costs; prohibiting an employer from taking specified adverse action against an employee under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1016
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1314 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/08/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/09/2016
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2016 2/08/2016 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/09/2016 2/09/2016 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2016 3/14/2016 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-507, 3-507.2, 3-507.3, 3-508 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM