Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Tax Credits - Enterprise Zones, RISE Zones, and Maryland Jobs Development Projects
Sponsored by
Chair, Ways and Means Committee (By Request - Departmental - Commerce)
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering from 10 years to 5 years the length of time the designation of an enterprise zone is effective under the enterprise zone tax credit program; altering the tax credit that may be claimed under the Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zone program; establishing the Maryland Jobs Development Tax Credit that may be claimed against the income, franchise, and insurance premium taxes; providing for the calculation and refundability of the tax credit; applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2016; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2017
Legislative Date
2/06/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2017 2/06/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Tax Credits - Enterprise Zones, RISE Zones, and Maryland Jobs Development Projects
House 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-101, 2.5-109, 5-1406, 5-704, 5-706, 5-707, 5-709, 6-801 through 6-811 )
(   6-123 )
(   10-702, 10-741, 8-222 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM