Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Advisory Board for Juvenile Services - Membership
Sponsored by
Delegates Crutchfield, Acevero, Bartlett, D.M. Davis, Griffith, Lopez, Shetty, Valentino-Smith, R. Watson, and Williams
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 353
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Expanding the membership of the State Advisory Board for Juvenile Services to include two additional members from the Department of Juvenile Services.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0467
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Advisory Board for Juvenile Services - Membership
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - State Advisory Board for Juvenile Services - Membership
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (98-39)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
49A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 353
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - State Advisory Board for Juvenile Services - Membership
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - State Advisory Board for Juvenile Services - Membership
House 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/03/2020 3/03/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 40
Text - Third - State Advisory Board for Juvenile Services - Membership
House 3/05/2020 3/05/2020 Third Reading Passed (98-39) 42
Senate 3/06/2020 3/03/2020 Referred Judicial Proceedings 42
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/14/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 48
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 49
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Returned Passed 49A
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 353
Text - Chapter - State Advisory Board for Juvenile Services - Membership
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-101, 9-212 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:09 PM