Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Workers' Compensation - Public Safety Employees
Sponsored by
Delegates Cluster, DeBoy, and McDermott
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that an occupational disease presumption applies to specified deputy sheriffs who develop heart disease and hypertension under specified circumstances; and providing for enhanced workers' compensation benefits for specified deputy sheriffs for a compensable permanent partial disability of less than a specified number of weeks.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2013 2/07/2013 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-503, 9-628, 9-629 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM