Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Corporations – Transfer of Assets and Exchange of Shares of Stock
Sponsored by
Delegate Kramer
Status
In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing a certain provision of law specifying a certain processing fee for articles of transfer; repealing each provision of law regarding executing and filing articles of transfer; altering the types of actions not required by a corporation for certain transfers of assets, creations of security interests, or exchanges of shares of stocks; clarifying that a transfer of assets by a corporation occurring before October 1, 2018, is not invalid solely because of a failure to file articles of transfer; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0659
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2018
Legislative Date
2/02/2018
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Corporations – Transfer of Assets and Exchange of Shares of Stock
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2018
Legislative Date
2/02/2018
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {293890/1 Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Corporations – Transfer of Assets and Exchange of Shares of Stock
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2018 2/02/2018 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Corporations – Transfer of Assets and Exchange of Shares of Stock
House 2/02/2018 2/02/2018 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 Hearing canceled
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/02/2018 3/24/2018 Favorable with Amendments {293890/1 Adopted 58
House 4/02/2018 3/24/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58
Text - Third - Corporations – Transfer of Assets and Exchange of Shares of Stock
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 59
Senate 4/04/2018 3/30/2018 Referred Rules 61
Senate 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-101, 1-203, 1-301, 3-104, 3-107, 3-108, 3-109, 3-110, 3-111, 3-112, 3-113, 3-115, 3-203 )
(   14-113 )
(   12-101, 12-103, 12-109, 13-101, 13-404 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM