Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Public Schools - Parent Empowerment
Sponsored by
Delegates Bates, Afzali, Aumann, Boteler, Dwyer, Eckardt, Elliott, George, Hough, Kipke, Krebs, McComas, McDonough, Oaks, Otto, Ready, B. Robinson, Schulz, Stocksdale, Stukes, Szeliga, Vitale, and Wood
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing parents and legal guardians of students attending public schools that are not meeting State accountability goals to petition county boards of education to implement interventions; requiring county boards to notify the State Superintendent of Schools and the State Board of Education on receipt of petitions and of the final dispositions regarding the petitions; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0831 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2013 2/07/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9.5-101 through 9.5-106 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM