Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Specialty Drugs
Sponsored by
Delegates Kipke, Bromwell, Kach, A. Kelly, McComas, Ready, and Tarrant
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a pharmacy benefits manager to designate on a specified formulary the prescription drugs that are Tier I specialty drugs and Tier II specialty drugs; requiring a pharmacy benefits manager to submit a list of specified drugs to the Maryland Insurance Commissioner and to update the list with a specified frequency; requiring a pharmacy benefits manager to allow specified pharmacies and pharmacists to dispense specified specialty drugs if the pharmacist or pharmacy meets specified requirements; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0825
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
4/03/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2014 2/05/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/02/2014 4/03/2014 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-1632 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM