Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Montgomery County - Distracted Driving Monitoring Systems - Authorization MC 24-20
Sponsored by
Montgomery County Delegation
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Authorizing a law enforcement agency in Montgomery County to place distracted driver monitoring systems on highways located in Montgomery County, if authorized by the governing body of Montgomery County; requiring that a recorded image made by a distracted driver monitoring system include an image of the vehicle, the license plates, and the time, date, and location of the violation; providing that the driver of a motor vehicle recorded committing a certain violation is subject to a certain civil penalty of up to $500; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2020
Legislative Date
2/12/2020
Action
Reassigned to Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Montgomery County - Distracted Driving Monitoring Systems - Authorization MC 24-20
House 2/12/2020 2/12/2020 Reassigned to Environment and Transportation 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   10-311, 4-401, 7-302 )
(   21-1124, 21-1124.1, 21-1124.2, 21-1124.4 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:09 PM
Click to return on the top page