Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Integrity Act of 2017
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Administration)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 31
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering provisions of the ethics law governing the period of time during which former members of the General Assembly are prohibited from representing or assisting specified parties for compensation in specified matters; altering the penalty for a specified offense relating to bribery of a public employee; altering the definition of "legislative action" to include testimony and other advocacy; prohibiting a state official from using public resources to solicit specified political contributions; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0683
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2017
Legislative Date
2/06/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Integrity Act of 2017
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {730510/1 Adopted
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {433929/1 (Delegate Szeliga)
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 03/22 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/20/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {433929/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Withdrawn
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/20/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {393224/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/20/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Integrity Act of 2017
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {184238/1 Adopted
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {353423/1 (Senator Miller) Adopted (46-0)
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Public Integrity Act of 2017
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/11/2017
Legislative Date
4/11/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 31
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Public Integrity Act of 2017
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2017 2/06/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Public Integrity Act of 2017
House 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2017 3/21/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/21/2017 3/18/2017 Favorable with Amendments {730510/1 Adopted 52 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2017 3/18/2017 Floor Amendment {433929/1 (Delegate Szeliga) 52 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2017 3/18/2017 Motion Special Order until 03/22 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted 52 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/23/2017 3/20/2017 Floor Amendment {433929/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Withdrawn 54 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/23/2017 3/20/2017 Floor Amendment {393224/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted 54 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/23/2017 3/20/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Integrity Act of 2017
House 3/24/2017 3/21/2017 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2017 3/23/2017 Referred Rules 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2017 3/30/2017 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2017 4/05/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable with Amendments {184238/1 Adopted 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Floor Amendment {353423/1 (Senator Miller) Adopted (46-0) 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 House Concurs Senate Amendments 66 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 66 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Public Integrity Act of 2017
Post Passage 4/11/2017 4/11/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 31
Text - Chapter - Public Integrity Act of 2017
(   9-201 )
(   5-101, 5-501, 5-502, 5-504, 5-506, 5-512, 5-513, 5-514, 5-602, 5-606, 5-607, 5-704 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page