Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Ratepayer Reduction for Renewable Energy Act
Sponsored by
Delegates Clippinger, R. Lewis, and Pena-Melnyk
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a certain electric company to contract for certain renewable energy credits and electricity generated from certain Tier 1 renewable sources to meet a certain portion of the renewable energy portfolio standard for electricity that the electric company provides to certain customers beginning in 2020; requiring an electric company to solicit bids for a certain contract from certain renewable energy facilities; requiring an electric company to submit a certain contract to the Public Service Commission; applying the Act prospectively; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0910
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Ratepayer Reduction for Renewable Energy Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Ratepayer Reduction for Renewable Energy Act
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing canceled
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-701, 7-703.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM