Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Demolition Work - Safety Provisions and Permitting
Sponsored by
Delegates Rosenberg, Carr, Carter, and Oaks
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a contractor to obtain a permit for demolition work in a specified manner; requiring a specified contractor to obtain a demolition permit from the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation; requiring the demolition permit applicant to submit a specified application to the Department and pay a specified fee to the Department; requiring the Department to adopt regulations; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/08/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/09/2016
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2016 2/08/2016 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/09/2016 2/09/2016 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2016 3/08/2016 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
(   12-705 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page