Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance - Lyme Disease and Related Tick-Borne Illnesses - Long-Term Antibiotic Treatment
Sponsored by
Delegates K. Young, Afzali, Angel, Arentz, Barron, Barve, Brooks, Carozza, Carr, Chang, Ciliberti, Folden, Gutierrez, Hettleman, Hornberger, Impallaria, Kelly, Kipke, Kramer, Lisanti, Mautz, McComas, McDonough, Metzgar, Miele, Moon, Morgan, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Robinson, Rose, Sample-Hughes, Shoemaker, Tarlau, Vogt, Waldstreicher, West, Wilkins, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring certain insurers, nonprofit health service plans, and health maintenance organizations to provide coverage for certain long-term antibiotic treatment of Lyme disease and related tick-borne illnesses under certain circumstances; prohibiting an entity subject to the Act from denying certain treatment under certain circumstances; providing the Act applies to all policies, contracts, and health benefit plans issued, delivered, or renewed in the State on or after January 1, 2019; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0793
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
4/07/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Health Insurance - Lyme Disease and Related Tick-Borne Illnesses - Long-Term Antibiotic Treatment
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 4/07/2018 4/07/2018 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-853 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM