Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Counties and Municipalities - Transportation of Animals - Limitation on Authority
Sponsored by
Delegates Arikan, Bagnall, Boyce, Cassilly, Clark, Cox, Fraser-Hidalgo, Guyton, Hornberger, Johnson, Kerr, Kittleman, Parrott, Reilly, Stein, and Szeliga
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the governing body of a county or municipality, unless expressly authorized by federal or State law, from enacting a local law that restricts or prohibits the transportation of certain animals for education, exhibition, competition, or entertainment purposes; and providing that in the event of a conflict between the application of the Act and certain provisions of federal or State law regarding animal care or public health and safety, the provisions of federal or State law shall control.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Counties and Municipalities - Transportation of Animals - Limitation on Authority
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM