Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicles - Aggressive Driving
Sponsored by
Delegates C. Howard, Folden, Angel, D. Barnes, Barron, Fennell, Frush, Jackson, Knotts, J. Lewis, Pena-Melnyk, Proctor, Sanchez, Tarlau, Walker, and A. Washington
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the motor vehicle offense of aggressive driving to include the commission of a certain number of an alternate set of certain motor vehicle offenses under certain circumstances; and establishing that certain persons charged with a violation for aggressive driving must appear in court and may not prepay the fine.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0333 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Motor Vehicles - Aggressive Driving
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/11/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Motor Vehicles - Aggressive Driving
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (128-8)
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Motor Vehicles - Aggressive Driving
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/14/2018 3/11/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 45
Text - Third - Motor Vehicles - Aggressive Driving
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Third Reading Passed (128-8) 46A
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Judicial Proceedings 48A
Senate 3/20/2018 3/20/2018 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-402, 21-901.2, 21-905 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM