Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Miscellaneous Provisions
Sponsored by
Delegate Feldman
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that a Maryland corporation or a real estate investment trust has the power to renounce specified business opportunities in its charter or declaration of trust or by a specified resolution; repealing specified provisions of law relating to dividends payable in shares of one class of a corporation's stock to holders of shares of another class of the corporation's stock; altering the circumstances under which a corporation registered as an open-end company may redeem shares of its stock from any stockholder; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0578
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/27/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/27/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/01/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/04/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2013 2/07/2013 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/07/2013 2/07/2013 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/25/2013 2/26/2013 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 2/27/2013 2/27/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 36
House 2/27/2013 2/27/2013 Second Reading Passed 36
House 3/01/2013 3/01/2013 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 38
Senate 3/04/2013 3/04/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 37
Senate 4/04/2013 4/04/2013 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-103, 2-309, 2-310.1, 2-403, 2-404, 2-405, 2-408, 2-502, 2-503, 2-507, 2-510, 3-104, 3-105, 3-109, 3-511, 8-102, 8-201, 8-301, 8-501.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM