Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
St. Mary's County - Taxicabs - Repeal of Local Provisions
Sponsored by
St. Mary's County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 283
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing provisions of law that relate to the regulation of taxicabs in St. Mary's County.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1001
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/09/2016
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2016
Legislative Date
2/29/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/01/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/01/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2016
Legislative Date
3/03/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/04/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
56A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/26/2016
Legislative Date
4/26/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 283
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2016 2/10/2016 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/09/2016 2/09/2016 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/26/2016 2/29/2016 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/01/2016 3/01/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 35
House 3/01/2016 3/01/2016 Second Reading Passed 35
House 3/03/2016 3/03/2016 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 37
Senate 3/04/2016 3/04/2016 First Reading Finance 37
Senate 3/16/2016 3/16/2016 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/30/2016 3/31/2016 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/31/2016 3/27/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 56A
Senate 3/31/2016 3/27/2016 Second Reading Passed 56A
Senate 4/01/2016 3/28/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 57
House 4/01/2016 3/27/2016 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 4/26/2016 4/26/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 283
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   133-1 through 133-3 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM