Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Equipment - Prohibition on Counterfeit Airbags and Substandard Airbags
Sponsored by
Delegates Mitchell, Arora, Clippinger, Conaway, Glenn, McDermott, B. Robinson, Rosenberg, Valentino-Smith, Waldstreicher, Walker, and Zucker
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from making, distributing, or selling a counterfeit airbag or a substandard airbag; prohibiting a person from installing a counterfeit airbag or a substandard airbag in a motor vehicle; prohibiting a person from selling or installing a device that causes the vehicle diagnostic system to inaccurately indicate that the airbag is functional when a counterfeit airbag or a substandard airbag is installed; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2013
Legislative Date
2/14/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2013
Legislative Date
2/14/2013
Action
Reassigned to Judiciary
Proceedings
27
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2013
Legislative Date
2/14/2013
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2013 2/07/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 2/07/2013 2/07/2013 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/14/2013 2/14/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 2/14/2013 2/14/2013 Reassigned to Judiciary 27
House 2/14/2013 2/14/2013 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/19/2013 3/20/2013 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   22-419, 27-101 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM