Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Credit - Student Loan Payments
Sponsored by
Delegates Reznik, Rosenberg, and Luedtke
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing a qualified taxpayer a credit against the State income tax for up to 50% of the qualified student loan payments made by the taxpayer during the taxable year; providing that the credit may not exceed the lesser of 20% of the average annual tuition during the taxable year at all institutions of higher education or $2,500; requiring the Comptroller to adopt specified regulations; defining specified terms; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2013; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0632
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2014 2/05/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/06/2014 2/06/2014 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-736 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM