Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Bay Tax Equity Act
Sponsored by
Delegates Moon, Carr, Frush, Gutierrez, A. Miller, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, S. Robinson, Smith, and Tarlau
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a specified chicken manure pollution fee payable to the Comptroller by a specified poultry integrator in a specified manner; requiring the Comptroller to transfer revenue from the fee to the Maryland Agriculture Water Quality Cost Share Program in the Department of Agriculture for specified cover crop activities; repealing specified provisions of law requiring the Comptroller to disburse specified funds from the Bay Restoration Fund to be used for specified cover crop activities; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0533
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0905 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2015
Legislative Date
2/19/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2015
Legislative Date
2/19/2015
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/13/2015 2/13/2015 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/19/2015 2/19/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 2/19/2015 2/19/2015 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/18/2015 3/19/2015 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-704.3 )
(   9-1605.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM