Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Angel Investor Tax Credit Program
Sponsored by
Delegates Palakovich Carr, Lierman, Buckel, Carey, Crosby, Ebersole, Gilchrist, Guyton, Hettleman, Morgan, Patterson, Qi, Solomon, and Wilkins
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing a credit against the State income tax for a certain percentage of an investment made in a qualified innovation business, not to exceed $50,000, or $100,000 for a qualified investor that is a married couple filing jointly or a pass-through entity; requiring a qualified investor to meet certain requirements in order to be eligible for the credit; applying the Act to certain taxable years beginning after December 31, 2018; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax - Angel Investor Tax Credit Program
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax - Angel Investor Tax Credit Program
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-749 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM