Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Corporate Income Tax - Main Street Employer Tax Rebate
Sponsored by
Delegates Mizeur, Bobo, Cullison, Gutierrez, A. Kelly, Lafferty, Lee, Luedtke, Minnick, Norman, S. Robinson, and Sophocleus
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring specified corporations to compute Maryland taxable income using a specified method; requiring that, subject to specified regulations, specified groups of corporations file a combined income tax return; establishing the Small Business Personal Property Tax Rebate Program to provide personal property tax rebates to businesses with 25 or fewer employees; establishing the Small Business Personal Property Tax Rebate Fund; providing for the purposes of the Fund; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after Dec. 31, 2013; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1158 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2014 2/05/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/06/2014 2/06/2014 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-402.1, 10-811, 2-613.1, 2-614, 2-615 )
(   2-301, 2-302 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM