Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Child Abuse and Neglect - Disclosure of Identifying Information
Sponsored by
Delegate R. Lewis
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Executive Director of the Social Services Administration to provide the Secretary of Health with identifying information regarding an individual who has had the individual's parental rights terminated under a certain provision of law and who has been suspected of abuse or neglect; and requiring the Department of Human Services to report to the Governor and General Assembly on the implementation of a plan by the State to search certain databases of other states to identify persons responsible for abuse and neglect; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1041
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Child Abuse and Neglect - Disclosure of Identifying Information
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2020
Legislative Date
2/19/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Child Abuse and Neglect - Disclosure of Identifying Information
House 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/19/2020 2/19/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/24/2020 9:55 AM