Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Review Property Tax Assessment Procedures and the Assessment Appeals Process
Sponsored by
Delegates Glass, McComas, and McDonough
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a Task Force to Review Property Tax Assessment Procedures and the Assessment Appeals Process; establishing the composition of the Task Force; requiring the Governor to designate the chair of the Task Force; providing for the staffing for the Task Force; prohibiting a member of the Task Force from receiving specified compensation; requiring that the Task Force issue a report by January 1, 2014; and terminating the Act at the end of June 30, 2014.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0881 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2013 2/07/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM