Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Reduction of Lead Risk in Housing - Applicability and Registration Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegates Stein, Holmes, McMillan, and Weir
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the application of the Reduction of Lead Risk in Housing Law to apply to specified property constructed before 1966; requiring specified owners to register specified properties built between January 1, 1966, and December 31, 1977, both inclusive, in a specified manner; providing civil penalties for registration violations; providing a registration fee for specified property; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0924 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2014 2/05/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-801, 6-803, 6-811.1, 6-817, 6-819, 6-843 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM