Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Trust Act - Nonjudicial Settlement Agreements
Sponsored by
Delegate West
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 222
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing, on or after October 1, 2016, specified interested persons to enter into a binding nonjudicial settlement agreement with respect to a matter involving a trust; providing that the nonjudicial settlement agreement is valid only to a specified extent; authorizing an interested person to request a court to make specified determinations with respect to the agreement; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0571
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
71
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/26/2016
Legislative Date
4/26/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 222
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2016 2/10/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/17/2016 3/17/2016 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/17/2016 3/15/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 47
House 3/17/2016 3/15/2016 Second Reading Passed 47
House 3/18/2016 3/16/2016 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 48
Senate 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 47A
Senate 4/07/2016 4/08/2016 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 62
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Second Reading Passed 62
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 67
House 4/11/2016 4/08/2016 Returned Passed 71
Post Passage 4/26/2016 4/26/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 222
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM