Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Qualified Maryland Toll Expenses
Sponsored by
Delegate Long
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for certain tolls paid through the use of the E-ZPass Maryland program; providing that the subtraction modification does not apply unless the amount of qualified toll expenses incurred by the taxpayer during the taxable year equals or exceeds $300; requiring a taxpayer to submit certain documentation to qualify for the subtraction modification; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2018; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1317 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2019
Legislative Date
2/12/2019
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Qualified Maryland Toll Expenses
House 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-208 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM