Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Paint Stewardship Program
Sponsored by
Delegates Boyce, Atterbeary, Bridges, Ebersole, Hettleman, Lehman, R. Lewis, Lierman, Moon, Palakovich Carr, Shetty, Smith, Terrasa, and K. Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring certain producers or a representative organization to submit a plan for the establishment of a Paint Stewardship Program to the Department of the Environment on or before January 1, 2021, and in accordance with certain requirements; requiring the Department to review and approve certain plans, including a certain assessment, submitted in accordance with the Paint Stewardship Program; prohibiting the sale of certain architectural paint under certain circumstances on a certain date; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Paint Stewardship Program
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters
Text - First - Maryland Paint Stewardship Program
House 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/25/2020 4:56 PM