Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Transit Administration - Farebox Recovery Rate - Repeal
Sponsored by
Delegates Lierman, Anderson, Beidle, Branch, Carter, Clippinger, Conaway, Frush, Glenn, Hammen, Hayes, Haynes, Korman, Lafferty, Lam, McCray, McIntosh, A. Miller, Morhaim, Oaks, B. Robinson, S. Robinson, Rosenberg, Stein, and M. Washington
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the requirement that a specified percentage of operating costs for specified public transit services must be recovered by the Maryland Transit Administration from specified revenues; altering requirements for annual reports submitted by the Administration to specified committees of the General Assembly; repealing the requirement that the Administration increase a specified base fare on a biennial basis; repealing the requirement that the Administration increase fares for transit service on a specified basis; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1035
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2016 2/10/2016 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM