Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Marijuana Laws – Full Disclosure of Legal, Employment, and Health Risks – Advertisement of Marijuana and Medical Cannabis
Sponsored by
Delegates Impallaria, Ciliberti, Folden, McComas, and McDonough
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a certifying provider, dispensary, processor, or grower from advertising marijuana or medical cannabis in any manner not allowed under federal law for advertisements of tobacco or tobacco products; requiring the Office of the Attorney General, at least 90 days before the implementation of any law that reduces penalties for or legalizes the use of marijuana, to establish a certain information system to notify the public of the risks related to the changes in the law; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1423 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2018
Legislative Date
2/06/2018
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Marijuana Laws – Full Disclosure of Legal, Employment, and Health Risks – Advertisement of Marijuana and Medical Cannabis
House 2/06/2018 2/06/2018 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM