Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Procurement - Microbusiness Payment Pilot Program
Sponsored by
Delegate Crosby
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a Microbusiness Payment Pilot Program to expedite payments to certain microbusinesses under a State procurement contract for supplies or services made by or on behalf of the Historic St. Mary's City Commission or St. Mary's College of Maryland; requiring a certain unit to make a payment under a certain procurement contract to a microbusiness not later than 7 days after the payment becomes due; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Procurement - Microbusiness Payment Pilot Program
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - State Procurement - Microbusiness Payment Pilot Program
House 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/05/2020 3/05/2020 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/5/2020 3:42 PM