Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Horse Racing - Prizes - Intercepts for Restitution and Child Support Payments
Sponsored by
Delegates Valentino-Smith, Barron, C. Howard, Jackson, Kramer, Krimm, Sanchez, Tarlau, and Valderrama
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Central Collection Unit and Child Support Enforcement Administration to certify to the State Racing Commission or a licensee of the Commission that a specified obligor is in arrears on specified payments; requiring the licensee to withhold and transfer specified prize amounts to specified collection agencies of the State; requiring the licensee to provide the obligor with a specified notice; authorizing the obligor to appeal the transfer; providing that the Act does not apply to prizes won on or before June 1, 2018; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0655
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2017
Legislative Date
2/06/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2017
Legislative Date
2/07/2017
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2017 2/06/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/07/2017 2/07/2017 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Horse Racing - Prizes - Intercepts for Restitution and Child Support Payments
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM