Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Hospitals - Prescription Drugs - Dispensing of Schedule III Drug Prescriptions
Sponsored by
Delegate Sample-Hughes
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring an accredited hospital to fill a prescription for and dispense a prescription drug that contains a Schedule III controlled dangerous substance and was prescribed at another accredited hospital in the State.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2019
Legislative Date
2/13/2019
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Hospitals - Prescription Drugs - Dispensing of Schedule III Drug Prescriptions
House 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   19-310.4 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page