Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Campaign Finance - Coordinated Expenditures
Sponsored by
Delegates Ebersole, Lafferty, Lam, Lierman, Luedtke, McCray, Moon, Morales, Platt, Reznik, Tarlau, Turner, A. Washington, and M. Washington
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 852
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from making a coordinated expenditure in excess of specified limits or making a donation to a person for the purpose of furthering a coordinated expenditure in excess of specified limits; prohibiting a candidate or political party from being the beneficiary of a coordinated expenditure in excess of specified limits; providing that a person may not be considered to have made a coordinated expenditure solely on specified grounds; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1201 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2017
Legislative Date
2/06/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Election Law - Campaign Finance - Coordinated Expenditures
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/11/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {955665/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/11/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 03/15 (Delegate Kaiser) Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/12/2017
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {875564/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/12/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 03/16 (Delegate Kaiser) Adopted
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {923829/1 (Delegate McDonough)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {923829/1 (Delegate McDonough) Withdrawn
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Election Law - Campaign Finance - Coordinated Expenditures
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (87-46)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (35-11)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/27/2017
Legislative Date
5/27/2017
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 852
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Election Law - Campaign Finance - Coordinated Expenditures
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2017 2/06/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Election Law - Campaign Finance - Coordinated Expenditures
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/14/2017 3/11/2017 Favorable with Amendments {955665/1 Adopted 45
House 3/14/2017 3/11/2017 Motion Special Order until 03/15 (Delegate Kaiser) Adopted 45
House 3/15/2017 3/12/2017 Floor Committee Amendment {875564/1 Adopted 46A
House 3/15/2017 3/12/2017 Motion Special Order until 03/16 (Delegate Kaiser) Adopted 46A
House 3/17/2017 3/14/2017 Floor Amendment {923829/1 (Delegate McDonough) 48
House 3/17/2017 3/14/2017 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted 48
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Floor Amendment {923829/1 (Delegate McDonough) Withdrawn 49
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49
Text - Third - Election Law - Campaign Finance - Coordinated Expenditures
House 3/20/2017 3/16/2017 Third Reading Passed (87-46) 50
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 46A
Senate 3/22/2017 3/22/2017 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2017 4/05/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable Adopted 60
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Second Reading Passed 60
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (35-11) 61
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Returned Passed 66
Post Passage 5/27/2017 5/27/2017 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 852
Text - Chapter - Election Law - Campaign Finance - Coordinated Expenditures
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-101, 13-249, 13-306, 13-604.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM