Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Harford County - Board of License Commissioners - Temporary License Application
Sponsored by
Harford County Delegation
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting, in Harford County, the Board of License Commissioners from requiring applications for certain temporary licenses to include copies of a catering contract or menu for the licensed event, the signature of the owner of the property where the licensed event is to be held, or a notarized application.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0114
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2018
Legislative Date
2/06/2018
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/10/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {963099/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/10/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Harford County - Board of License Commissioners - Temporary License Application
House 2/06/2018 2/06/2018 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/13/2018 3/10/2018 Favorable with Amendments {963099/1 Adopted 44
House 3/13/2018 3/10/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Text - Third - Harford County - Board of License Commissioners - Temporary License Application
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 46
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   22-102, 22-1301, 22-1302 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM