Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Biennial Motor Vehicle Safety and Equipment Inspections - Required
Sponsored by
Delegate Stein
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Prohibiting the Motor Vehicle Administration from renewing the registration of a motor vehicle if the applicant has not submitted a motor vehicle safety and equipment inspection certificate; requiring certain motor vehicles to complete a safety and equipment inspection; requiring under certain circumstances the inspection to be completed and the inspection certificate submitted to the Administration before the registration of a vehicle may be renewed; establishing that the maximum amount of the fee for the inspection is $20; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Biennial Motor Vehicle Safety and Equipment Inspections - Required
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Biennial Motor Vehicle Safety and Equipment Inspections - Required
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-406.3, 23-107.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM