Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Cornerstone Montgomery and Interfaith Works Project
Sponsored by
Delegates Dumais, Barkley, Barve, Carr, Cullison, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frick, Gilchrist, Gutierrez, Hixson, Kaiser, Kelly, Korman, Kramer, Luedtke, A. Miller, Moon, Morales, Platt, Reznik, S. Robinson, Smith, Waldstreicher, and Zucker
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the creation of a State Debt in specified years not to exceed $350,000 each year, the proceeds to be used as a grant to the Board of Directors of the Cornerstone Montgomery, Inc. and the Board of Directors of the Interfaith Works, Inc. for the acquisition, planning, design, construction, repair, renovation, reconstruction, and capital equipping of #2 Taft Court facility and for the relocation of Cornerstone Montgomery and Interfaith Works facilities, located in Montgomery County; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0492
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015, June 1, 2016, June 1, 2017, June 1, 2018, June 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2015
Legislative Date
3/04/2015
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/13/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Appropriations
House 3/04/2015 3/04/2015 Hearing 3/16 at 9:00 a.m.
House 4/13/2015 4/13/2015 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM