Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Personal Injury Protection - Rejection of Coverage
Sponsored by
Delegate Frick
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 426
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that, under specified circumstances, a first named insured under a specified policy of motor vehicle liability insurance is not required to obtain coverage for specified medical, hospital, and disability benefits that must be provided by specified insurers; requiring the Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund to offer a specified first named insured, at the time of application for a specified policy, the option to reject coverage for specified benefits under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0784
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/09/2016
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {793791/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-3)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/10/2016
Legislative Date
5/10/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 426
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2016 2/10/2016 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/09/2016 2/09/2016 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/31/2016 4/01/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/01/2016 3/27/2016 Favorable with Amendments {793791/1 Report Adopted 59
House 4/01/2016 3/27/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
House 4/04/2016 3/28/2016 Third Reading Passed (132-3) 60
Senate 4/04/2016 3/29/2016 First Reading Senate Rules 58
Senate 4/05/2016 4/06/2016 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 4/06/2016 4/06/2016 Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/07/2016 4/08/2016 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 62
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Second Reading Passed 62
Senate 4/11/2016 4/03/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 63A
House 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Returned Passed 69
Post Passage 5/10/2016 5/10/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 426
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   19-505, 19-506, 19-506.1 )
(   17-103 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM